Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sokolof Owen, against Unknown Tenant 2, Unknown Tenant 1, Association Of Poinciana Villages Inc, Poinciana Village Eight Association Inc., Poiciana Neighborhood Association Inc, (total of 8) See All represented by Eldredge Charles L Jr, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 CATHERINE L COMBEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 22, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE FORECLOSURE SALE VACATE CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND FOR | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE FORECLOSURE SALE VACATE CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND FOR RETURN OF FUNDS PAID | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE PAYMENT SUMMARY | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE FEE CALCULATION WORKSHEET | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT - CHRISTIAN GARCIA | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.