Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Taveres Jose, Taveres Eric, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Frick Joe J, against Tampa Tarp Inc, Freeman Jeffrey Harrison, represented by Reardon Emily J, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 08 STEVEN L SELPH presiding.
Case Number |
Judge08 STEVEN L SELPH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 20, 2019 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT-SETTLED IN PART-5/1/20 | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPROVE MINOR SETTLEMENT | |
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY | |
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FROM JEFFREY HARRISON FREEMAN INC | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS JOSE TAAVERES AS PARENT AND NATURAL GUARDIAN OF JT A | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.