Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
True Builders Inc., A A O Jill Sherrard, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Weber Alec L, against State Farm Florida Insurance Company, represented by Smith Burks A Iii, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2019 |
CategoryOthic - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION AND COMPEL | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 07/23/2020 10:00 AM | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION AND TO COMPEL | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 06/03/2020 10:00 AM | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 07/14/2020 10:45 AM | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TELEPHONIC HEARING | |
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event | CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.