Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fleetcor Technologies Operating Company, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Landau Francine Clair, against Godfather Carrier, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 08 STEVEN L SELPH presiding.
Case Number |
Judge08 STEVEN L SELPH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM IN AID OF EXECUTION VIA ZOOM | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE BANK OF AMERICA NA AND DEMAND TO PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS FES | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED - BANK OF AMERICA CORP. | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - BANK OF AMERICA | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK) | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ISSUED GODFATHER CARRIER INC (CLERK) | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - GODFATHER CARRIER INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.