Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Redding, James Bryan, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Constantinos Jeffrey, against Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company, represented by Pastis Adam, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 JOHN RADABAUGH presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 JOHN RADABAUGH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 15, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 02/02/2022 09:00 AM | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 02/02/2022 09:00 AM | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS AMENDED MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY PURSUANT TO RULE 1.720 | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.