Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
United States Of America Us Dept Ag Rural Develop, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Murphy Frederick J Jr, against Parsons, Breann Nicole, Polk County, Stacy W. Butterfield, Clerk Of Court In And For Polk County, Florida, State Of Florida, State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, (total of 6) See All represented by Jones Hastings, Stafford William H, Vogel Randall E, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 04 DANA Y MOORE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge04 DANA Y MOORE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 11, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ORIGINAL DOCUMENT | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RETURN OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE AND REAL ESTATE MORTGAGE | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR RETURN OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE AND REAL ESTATE MORTGAGE | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 12/17/2021 10:00 AM | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING STATES MOTION TO BE EXCUSED FROM ALL PRETRIAL MATTERS AND SCHEDULED CASE MANAGEMENT | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON SUBSTITUTION AND WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.