Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marcelin, Silfanie, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Matthews Earnest Terrell, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Meta Margo E, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 04 GERALD P HILL II presiding.
Case Number |
Judge04 GERALD P HILL II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 11, 2019 |
CategoryOthic - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 05/07/2021 02:30 PM | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 05/07/2021 02:30 PM | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL EARLY MEDIATION AND MOTION TO ABATE / STAY THE CASE PENDING | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES AND WITHDRAWAL OF PRIOR NOTICE OF | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
November 11, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
November 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/c9f8c8ad-a923-48d2-9694-2db689d337b1/results/589dd66d-f435-4d1f-94b3-01e2bfe640f5/lines/e18a741c-cfc4-43e4-a077-3142b60c6a7d/Doc NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.