Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Newrez Llc Dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Carey Molly Emma, against Asset Acceptance Llc, Mcclain Charlie Bennie Jr, Mcclain Shavonne L, Nottingham Homeowners Association Of Polk County Inc, The Unknownn Spouse Of Charlie Bennie Mcclain Jr, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM DEPUTY CLERK | |
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND INCORPORATED RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;198476;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/ceb37fb1-790c-47f9-b8e2-15d690364060/results/fe533c08-bc21-4aec-b5b9-2ddc77ae1edd/lines/3c1db47e-0bb1-4f24-9037-fa23c8259dac/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ THE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;188361;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/ceb37fb1-790c-47f9-b8e2-15d690364060/results/fe533c08-bc21-4aec-b5b9-2ddc77ae1edd/lines/9e35c8df-f34d-4f2e-adc5-e1790113ea0c/Doc CORRECTED SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ SHAVONNE L MCCLAIN |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;199132;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/ceb37fb1-790c-47f9-b8e2-15d690364060/results/fe533c08-bc21-4aec-b5b9-2ddc77ae1edd/lines/30e83db2-af1c-41e1-b066-4e972197e367/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHAVONNE L MCCLAIN |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;199107;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/ceb37fb1-790c-47f9-b8e2-15d690364060/results/fe533c08-bc21-4aec-b5b9-2ddc77ae1edd/lines/b6299dfe-0ba8-48ed-9d7a-348dc958c4cb/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHARLIE BENNIE MCCLAIN JR |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;198853;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/ceb37fb1-790c-47f9-b8e2-15d690364060/results/fe533c08-bc21-4aec-b5b9-2ddc77ae1edd/lines/269ac765-297d-42c0-9880-c03423a07f58/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ SHAVONNE L MCCLAIN |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;198716;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/ceb37fb1-790c-47f9-b8e2-15d690364060/results/fe533c08-bc21-4aec-b5b9-2ddc77ae1edd/lines/eb690e23-94e4-4e88-906f-47533f8bfba1/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ NOTTINGHAM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF POLK COUNTY INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.