Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Elliott Christopher, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Donner Jeffrey T, against Prepared Insurance Company, represented by Moran Katherine L, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 WILLIAM D SITES presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 WILLIAM D SITES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 07, 2019 |
CategoryOthic - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedApril 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT I OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF PLAINTIFF | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DEPOSITION OF THE | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 03/02/2020 01:15 PM | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.