Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nobrega, Anthony, Nobrega, Mary, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Makris Dean, against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company, represented by Gauthier Soobadra C, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 WILLIAM D SITES presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 WILLIAM D SITES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 07, 2019 |
CategoryOthic - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/86a0fa34-42ae-493a-84e5-fd5a16daac15/results/405f108a-4c48-4427-94f7-1bef900e6b11/lines/3686c5e1-4c66-443b-993a-cea874746927/Doc PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/86a0fa34-42ae-493a-84e5-fd5a16daac15/results/405f108a-4c48-4427-94f7-1bef900e6b11/lines/57cfef8d-7784-4e03-8585-e2ce27b345ee/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/86a0fa34-42ae-493a-84e5-fd5a16daac15/results/405f108a-4c48-4427-94f7-1bef900e6b11/lines/27debf5d-8781-4ebc-adc2-ab6e81b74335/Doc PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/86a0fa34-42ae-493a-84e5-fd5a16daac15/results/405f108a-4c48-4427-94f7-1bef900e6b11/lines/27debf5d-8781-4ebc-adc2-ab6e81b74335/Doc PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/86a0fa34-42ae-493a-84e5-fd5a16daac15/results/405f108a-4c48-4427-94f7-1bef900e6b11/lines/27debf5d-8781-4ebc-adc2-ab6e81b74335/Doc NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/86a0fa34-42ae-493a-84e5-fd5a16daac15/results/405f108a-4c48-4427-94f7-1bef900e6b11/lines/27debf5d-8781-4ebc-adc2-ab6e81b74335/Doc CIVIL COVER SHEET |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/86a0fa34-42ae-493a-84e5-fd5a16daac15/results/405f108a-4c48-4427-94f7-1bef900e6b11/lines/27debf5d-8781-4ebc-adc2-ab6e81b74335/Doc COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.