Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ray, Cecelia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kiley Timothy E, against Southflorida Pizza Llc D B A Dominos, Walker, Jamie M, represented by Lopez Richard A, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 WILLIAM D SITES presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 WILLIAM D SITES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 11, 2019 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 07/28/2021 10:00 AM | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 07/28/2021 10:00 AM | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | JAMIE M WALKER'S ANSWER / RESPONSE | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - SOUTH FLORIDA PIZZA LLC DBA DOMINOS | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-JAIME M WALKER | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/151154ea-718b-43e8-b42b-edea0faf51ac/results/92c55060-2cf2-44df-91f0-522b6825b0b9/lines/68c420a5-f1fd-4c98-865a-8962cfc6dada/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - SOUTH FLORIDA PIZZA LLC DBA DOMINOS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.