Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midflorida Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Jernigan, Teresa Ann, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 WILLIAM D SITES presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 WILLIAM D SITES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;152163;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e9762a57-6baa-47be-adad-effe30f40b09/results/a01a4646-d175-4b2d-9cac-24965b005049/lines/0e94b0e5-b16d-4376-8292-e0641e44d808/Doc NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM IN AID OF EXECUTION |
|
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;72146;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e9762a57-6baa-47be-adad-effe30f40b09/results/a01a4646-d175-4b2d-9cac-24965b005049/lines/498fb264-3a02-408d-9f29-670b131c1b55/Doc FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;81746;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e9762a57-6baa-47be-adad-effe30f40b09/results/a01a4646-d175-4b2d-9cac-24965b005049/lines/6b408a9e-ac76-48ec-b938-c395f8b5ccc4/Doc AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;72008;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e9762a57-6baa-47be-adad-effe30f40b09/results/a01a4646-d175-4b2d-9cac-24965b005049/lines/b29402f1-3469-41aa-a2fa-68ead478b94e/Doc AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;34687;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e9762a57-6baa-47be-adad-effe30f40b09/results/a01a4646-d175-4b2d-9cac-24965b005049/lines/1cc8a1f8-e05d-4ca0-9006-8d76d38545ec/Doc AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;66499;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e9762a57-6baa-47be-adad-effe30f40b09/results/a01a4646-d175-4b2d-9cac-24965b005049/lines/e8c7dc40-8c5e-4b13-bcb2-491e6e5777b8/Doc MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;37362;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e9762a57-6baa-47be-adad-effe30f40b09/results/a01a4646-d175-4b2d-9cac-24965b005049/lines/4b57c1df-74cd-4e94-9683-16d39fffb0e7/Doc NOTICE OF FILING |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;48897;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e9762a57-6baa-47be-adad-effe30f40b09/results/a01a4646-d175-4b2d-9cac-24965b005049/lines/4fd97cb1-293b-4658-9cfa-1b444e1f6b49/Doc CLERKS MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ISSUED/ TERESA ANN JERNIGAN AKA TERESA A JERNIGAN |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;176723;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e9762a57-6baa-47be-adad-effe30f40b09/results/a01a4646-d175-4b2d-9cac-24965b005049/lines/dd05211e-cfd1-418a-8dae-979116030456/Doc SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - TERESA ANN JERNIGAN AKA TERESA A JERNIGAN |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;52893;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e9762a57-6baa-47be-adad-effe30f40b09/results/a01a4646-d175-4b2d-9cac-24965b005049/lines/9d487b2e-9b28-4b29-9539-953382b45635/Doc MOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.