Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Joerger, Tammylynn, filed a(n) Prli - Products Liability case against Fca Us Llc, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 04 GERALD P HILL II presiding.
Case Number |
Judge04 GERALD P HILL II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2019 |
CategoryPrli - Products Liability |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;41587;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e17bec80-6283-4766-bfb6-4a03ffc61319/results/9678a6c9-d839-441b-99f3-64c1af7b9ed2/lines/4eeca2af-ac0d-4435-a1d9-a3bbba992200/Doc ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e17bec80-6283-4766-bfb6-4a03ffc61319/results/9678a6c9-d839-441b-99f3-64c1af7b9ed2/lines/8dc068cd-c35e-44b3-a5ff-b5275a7b5bf5/Doc JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e17bec80-6283-4766-bfb6-4a03ffc61319/results/9678a6c9-d839-441b-99f3-64c1af7b9ed2/lines/777b4d37-a2f6-4c6d-adb4-91dc0bfe40b1/Doc LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE- RECEIVED BY JUDGE |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e17bec80-6283-4766-bfb6-4a03ffc61319/results/9678a6c9-d839-441b-99f3-64c1af7b9ed2/lines/2ed5fbbe-a3f7-4c6e-9bc1-cdd85f45a8d8/Doc JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e17bec80-6283-4766-bfb6-4a03ffc61319/results/9678a6c9-d839-441b-99f3-64c1af7b9ed2/lines/fe7b0b1a-7c4c-4896-af91-4db2097b37c6/Doc PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e17bec80-6283-4766-bfb6-4a03ffc61319/results/9678a6c9-d839-441b-99f3-64c1af7b9ed2/lines/08e475ac-9207-41f3-80a1-e6127afe5413/Doc DEFENDANT FCA US LLC ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;93877;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/be3f644a-0690-4790-ad05-9a6c98275292/results/c84dd64d-776f-4a9f-b47d-7e6658a35c6d/lines/fc4d71c3-d102-49b0-b226-16e74f6dc1e9/Doc DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;88139;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/be3f644a-0690-4790-ad05-9a6c98275292/results/c84dd64d-776f-4a9f-b47d-7e6658a35c6d/lines/e7ff6469-46de-496f-96d4-1d5b6b8d789c/Doc NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e17bec80-6283-4766-bfb6-4a03ffc61319/results/9678a6c9-d839-441b-99f3-64c1af7b9ed2/lines/6e322b4c-23ab-4247-8be7-9a5c35fbac6f/Doc DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e17bec80-6283-4766-bfb6-4a03ffc61319/results/9678a6c9-d839-441b-99f3-64c1af7b9ed2/lines/3b6dd226-9995-4829-97b3-9faecf1e2aca/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- FCA US, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.