Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
C.A.G. Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Reesman Eric J, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2019 |
CategoryForjc - Foreign Judgment - Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT- SECURE PRO LLC | |
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SECURE PRO LLC | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES/SECURE PRO LLC | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | COPY OF MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT/ SECURE PRO LLC | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/049aff1d-aa34-4b81-8609-ce4d410d699f/results/80b22143-1c5e-474d-bc8d-31bdb1230b36/lines/0f715c40-50ce-49cd-8fe1-abaea62c4cd9/Doc MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES OF DEFENDANT ERIC J |
|
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/049aff1d-aa34-4b81-8609-ce4d410d699f/results/80b22143-1c5e-474d-bc8d-31bdb1230b36/lines/b362cfff-91d6-44e4-8a25-aec87216ec88/Doc CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT / ERIC J REESMAN |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;4090;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/049aff1d-aa34-4b81-8609-ce4d410d699f/results/80b22143-1c5e-474d-bc8d-31bdb1230b36/lines/8459ef8e-6178-4c15-bac4-93407ad77dc1/Doc NOTICE OF RECORDATION |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;4090;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/049aff1d-aa34-4b81-8609-ce4d410d699f/results/80b22143-1c5e-474d-bc8d-31bdb1230b36/lines/8459ef8e-6178-4c15-bac4-93407ad77dc1/Doc LETTER FROM DEPUTY CLERK |
|
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/049aff1d-aa34-4b81-8609-ce4d410d699f/results/80b22143-1c5e-474d-bc8d-31bdb1230b36/lines/9eb0d085-6d53-46b1-91b8-bd9dd11ac5da/Doc JUDGMENT FOREIGN (REDOCKETED TO CORRECT THE LEGIBILITY OF THE SEALS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.