Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Freedom Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Tenant In Possession Of The Subject Proper, Ross, Tara, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 03, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfn - Foreclosure Non Homestead Resident |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS DUE TO PAYOFF | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;45863;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e2d5723a-08a3-4550-b287-1f876769f2f7/results/09c743eb-8304-42e1-8ba3-a052e00930c2/lines/3d2f532f-bdf4-4a66-b776-ec9fdef37b64/Doc CLERKS MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ISSUED/ TARA ROSS AKA TARA LEANN ROSS AKA TARA L JONES AND |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;141853;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e2d5723a-08a3-4550-b287-1f876769f2f7/results/09c743eb-8304-42e1-8ba3-a052e00930c2/lines/abc47f7b-91d1-4a96-8095-d7992847a5a1/Doc AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;140493;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e2d5723a-08a3-4550-b287-1f876769f2f7/results/09c743eb-8304-42e1-8ba3-a052e00930c2/lines/ae711a49-6a22-4939-afe5-0cbecc9f3377/Doc MOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;35457;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/e2d5723a-08a3-4550-b287-1f876769f2f7/results/09c743eb-8304-42e1-8ba3-a052e00930c2/lines/21c530b4-666e-4f29-a05a-01f163a2b336/Doc NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CHOICE LEGAL GROUP PA MAILING ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.