Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dufour, Brenda, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Cappello Dylan M, against Lakeland Motors, Llc, represented by Thomas Walter C Jr, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 03, 2019 |
CategoryNegpl - Negligence Premises Liability Comm |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATORS REPORT - IMPASSE | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES (JANUARY 6, 2020) FROM DEFENSE COUNSEL ONLY | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES AND PHYSICAL ADDRESS CHANGE | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY/NON PARTIES | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.