Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lowe, Erica R, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lynd Craig R, against Diaz, Randy Reyes, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 WILLIAM D SITES presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 WILLIAM D SITES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2019 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT DEFENDANTS RANDY REYES DIAZ MOTION FOR MORE TIME | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MORE TIME | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 03/01/2022 01:30 PM | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - RANDY DIAZ | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - RANDY DIAZ | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED FOR A SUBPOENA-RANDY DIAZ BY SERVING TAMATHA CONERLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.