Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Galzignato, Fabio, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Mjc Classic Cars Llc, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 WILLIAM D SITES presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 WILLIAM D SITES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;25215;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/0981a218-f541-4991-96c5-1f09213ccbee/results/76406f74-0dce-4042-907f-90c267689a3b/lines/398dfe7a-4fbe-42d2-817b-6cad1a5d6668/Doc ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/0981a218-f541-4991-96c5-1f09213ccbee/results/76406f74-0dce-4042-907f-90c267689a3b/lines/4d63e7c4-6b06-44d6-a710-b482dfb669b1/Doc PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;75290;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/0981a218-f541-4991-96c5-1f09213ccbee/results/76406f74-0dce-4042-907f-90c267689a3b/lines/65a4878a-aebe-40cf-8394-91650b71b9f8/Doc CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;51163;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/0981a218-f541-4991-96c5-1f09213ccbee/results/76406f74-0dce-4042-907f-90c267689a3b/lines/cfd4bfb0-587c-4321-aeea-7b63ba6cda2c/Doc FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/0981a218-f541-4991-96c5-1f09213ccbee/results/76406f74-0dce-4042-907f-90c267689a3b/lines/03ed984b-dbe5-453a-be60-9561c1f2e4d1/Doc PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF COSTS |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/0981a218-f541-4991-96c5-1f09213ccbee/results/76406f74-0dce-4042-907f-90c267689a3b/lines/03ed984b-dbe5-453a-be60-9561c1f2e4d1/Doc PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT |
|
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;20316;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/0981a218-f541-4991-96c5-1f09213ccbee/results/76406f74-0dce-4042-907f-90c267689a3b/lines/71aa33f4-50a6-408b-a471-59bac73844cd/Doc CLERKS DEFAULT/ MJC CLASSIC CARS LLC |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/0981a218-f541-4991-96c5-1f09213ccbee/results/76406f74-0dce-4042-907f-90c267689a3b/lines/1db59fe8-ceb0-4827-b31e-084db16dcc18/Doc SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED / MJC CLASSIC CARS LLC |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;14236;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/0981a218-f541-4991-96c5-1f09213ccbee/results/76406f74-0dce-4042-907f-90c267689a3b/lines/26e1a90b-124a-4cbb-9994-1f8e5b26424f/Doc DEFAULT (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK) |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;25954;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/0981a218-f541-4991-96c5-1f09213ccbee/results/76406f74-0dce-4042-907f-90c267689a3b/lines/1545a8f8-7a64-4dc7-90e3-4aa5c25a1e74/Doc MOTION FOR DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.