Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Yokshas, Joseph, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Van Den Boom Peter W, against Hantge, Donald, represented by James Jack P Iii, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2019 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 04/01/2021 09:00 AM | |
September 13, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
September 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
September 13, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR'S REPORT - SETTLEMENT | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT DONALD HANTGE | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT DONALD HANTGE VIA ZOOM CONFERENCE | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.