Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bell, Aubrey, Save Money And Retain Temperature, Llc D B A Smart Efficient Solutions, Bell, Priscilla, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Dombrosky Mark A, against Geovera Advantage Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 CATHERINE L COMBEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ATTORNEYS CHARGING LIEN | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 03/31/2021 03:00 PM | |
June 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/6ed94098-873b-48aa-b8d2-3a86049ea42d/results/5abd7427-a21e-43d1-b7a0-843382aad251/lines/b26ba483-e812-438a-aa2f-540d43365f66/Doc PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF REQUESTING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE |
|
June 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/6ed94098-873b-48aa-b8d2-3a86049ea42d/results/5abd7427-a21e-43d1-b7a0-843382aad251/lines/b26ba483-e812-438a-aa2f-540d43365f66/Doc PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT |
|
June 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/6ed94098-873b-48aa-b8d2-3a86049ea42d/results/5abd7427-a21e-43d1-b7a0-843382aad251/lines/b26ba483-e812-438a-aa2f-540d43365f66/Doc PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.