Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Save Money And Retain Temperature Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Smith A Lee, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Frantzman Dennis M, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 04 DANA Y MOORE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge04 DANA Y MOORE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDD NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONS CORPORATE | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 04/18/2022 09:30 AM | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PROFESSIONAL COURTESY / NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 10/19/2021 11:30 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.