Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Save Money And Retain Temperature Llc Dba Smart Efficient Solutions Aao Kevin & Karen White, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Dombrosky Mark A, against Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Insurance Company Inc, represented by Herard Kyara, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 CATHERINE L COMBEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 05/03/2022 02:00 PM | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL TRACK | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 07/22/2021 01:00 PM | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 07/22/2021 01:00 PM | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ATTORNEYS CHARGING LIEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.