Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Smart Storm Solutions Llc Aao Cynthia Waring And Andrew Waring, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Dombrosky Mark A, against Southern Fidelity Insurance Company, represented by Shevenell Keith G, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT - AGREEMENT | |
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY PURSUANT TO RULE 1.720 | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY PURSUANT TO FLA R CIV P 1.720 | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE- RECEIVED BY JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.