Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-3, A D, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Salomone Kenneth L, against Hansberry Deloris, Hansberry Ivan, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 03/31/2021 10:45 AM | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING(COPY) | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 08/24/2020 11:00 AM | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.