Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Prather Quarpaesha R., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Anderson David F, against Reinante Jocelyn, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2019 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 09/21/2020 11:00 AM | |
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
August 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 09/21/2020 11:00 AM | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/86191d15-ac08-448e-86c1-36bd6f1b4d5a/results/64d2662c-6837-457e-9b1d-80cc75157e22/lines/bd5adac8-6a59-4e5c-89b1-0175ebc426e0/Doc SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-JOCELYN REINANTE |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;98959;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/86191d15-ac08-448e-86c1-36bd6f1b4d5a/results/64d2662c-6837-457e-9b1d-80cc75157e22/lines/0061519c-8f16-4fa5-950c-2e6f10e395f7/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ JOCELYN REINANTE |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;302231;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/86191d15-ac08-448e-86c1-36bd6f1b4d5a/results/64d2662c-6837-457e-9b1d-80cc75157e22/lines/ff3688a0-0f9a-45a4-9662-9ece82bdd578/Doc PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/86191d15-ac08-448e-86c1-36bd6f1b4d5a/results/64d2662c-6837-457e-9b1d-80cc75157e22/lines/c876b9c8-7888-4bfe-9421-66a40b0a7232/Doc PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/86191d15-ac08-448e-86c1-36bd6f1b4d5a/results/64d2662c-6837-457e-9b1d-80cc75157e22/lines/c876b9c8-7888-4bfe-9421-66a40b0a7232/Doc REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT JOCELYN REINATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.