Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fishman Barry Stuart, against Ashley Manor Homeowners Association Of Polk County Inc, Gregory R Wilson As Trustee Of Lq Enterprises A Texas Joint Stock Company, Kozkemyakina Anna A, Lavine, Darrin C, Navy Federal Credit Union, (total of 10) See All represented by Rosin Scott A, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 JOHN RADABAUGH presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 JOHN RADABAUGH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfn - Foreclosure Non Homestead Resident |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 04/05/2022 03:00 PM | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST TO BE REMOVED FROM SERVIC | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | WILLIAM J SIMONITSCHS MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | RE NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS OF GREGORY WILSON | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | WELLS FARGO BANK NAS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS OF DARRIN LAVINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.