Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mather, James, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Turnbull Sanga T, against Progressive American Insurance Company, Vernanza, Angelica Borja, represented by Bench Timothy Newell, Schell David W, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 08 JAMES A YANCEY presiding.
Case Number |
Judge08 JAMES A YANCEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR NON COMPLIANCE WITH CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 04/13/2022 02:30 PM | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.