Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Clendening Carly M, against United States Of America Department Of Housing And Urban Development, Unknown Tenant 2, Unknown Tenant 1, Pennewell Jennifer L, Pennewell, James, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ORIGINAL DOCUMENT | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE WITH ATTACHMENTS | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND DISMISS ACTION | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND DISMISS ACTION | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 04/28/2020 09:00 AM | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 04/28/2020 09:00 AM | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF THE AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS TOGETHER WITH BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVIT OF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.