Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Medina, Orlando, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Patrick Michael, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Louis Saint Ducarmel, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 08 JAMES A YANCEY presiding.
Case Number |
Judge08 JAMES A YANCEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING - CONSENT TO CONTINUED REPRESENTATION | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AND | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING AND RELIANCE UPON - EXHIBIT 1 TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING PROCEEDINGS VIA | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO, AND MOTION TO STRIKE, THE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND EMAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.