Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Seright Otis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Crane A Crosby, against Hazelwood Mary, Nelson Elsa, Peterson Glen Jerrell, Plath Enterprises, represented by Calvo-Paquette Lourdes, De Maio Alexandra M, Lambert Vicki L, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 04 GERALD P HILL II presiding.
Case Number |
Judge04 GERALD P HILL II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 24, 2019 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 11/25/2020 09:00 AM | |
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PERSON | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF EXAMINATION PURSUANT TO F. R. C. P. 1.360 | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY (SIC) | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION UNDER FLA R CIV P 1.360 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.