Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Reyes, Minerva, Canales, Angel, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Constantinos Jeffrey, Faria Eduardo J, against American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida, represented by Stein Michael B, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 03, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING MEDIATION | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NOTICE OF POSTPONEMENT OF DEPOSITION | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.