Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ditech Financial Llc Fka Green Tree Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Spouse Of Garnet K. Allbright, Allbright, Garnet K, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 08 STEVEN L SELPH presiding.
Case Number |
Judge08 STEVEN L SELPH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 03, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | COPY OF REQUESTED CHECK | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | CHECK REQUEST TO DISBURSE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF BID |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.