Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Tenant In Possession Of The Subject Property, Unknown Spouse Of Carol D Cowing, Cowing, Carol D, Unknown Spouse Of Brittney A Skinner, Skinner, Brittney A, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 CATHERINE L COMBEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 07, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT(CAROL D COWING AND UNKNOWN TENANT NKA PAUL ANDERSON | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT-UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRITTNEY A. SKINNER AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAROL | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION UNSIGNED DEFAULT | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER / RESPONSE - BRITTNEY WALKER FKA BRITTNEY SKINNER | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRITTNEY A SKINNER | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY BY SERVING BRITTNEY | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAROL D COWING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.