Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Olibrus, Marianna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Martin, Phillip, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 CATHERINE L COMBEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2019 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;48335;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/cb4c67ef-14cd-4fd7-9df8-5c16db278eab/results/60b14d02-968a-4ff2-a843-c49f9ab6619f/lines/c26c3b29-0633-4bf1-a2f3-893046ebdf7f/Doc NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/cb4c67ef-14cd-4fd7-9df8-5c16db278eab/results/60b14d02-968a-4ff2-a843-c49f9ab6619f/lines/1d373dea-f744-4307-9313-85c4144ff6e0/Doc DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/cb4c67ef-14cd-4fd7-9df8-5c16db278eab/results/60b14d02-968a-4ff2-a843-c49f9ab6619f/lines/0495f291-6b7d-4a54-b7c0-b6a62bc10fd7/Doc DEFENDANT PHILLIP MARTIN'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/cb4c67ef-14cd-4fd7-9df8-5c16db278eab/results/60b14d02-968a-4ff2-a843-c49f9ab6619f/lines/db93f0a2-8edd-4d72-bc2f-1c198e60f56e/Doc NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2 516 |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;34983;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/cb4c67ef-14cd-4fd7-9df8-5c16db278eab/results/60b14d02-968a-4ff2-a843-c49f9ab6619f/lines/b1ea205b-37a9-4993-8479-ab2e2e5524a8/Doc SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- PHILLIP MARTIN BY SERVING SHANNON GOULD |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;98312;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/cb4c67ef-14cd-4fd7-9df8-5c16db278eab/results/60b14d02-968a-4ff2-a843-c49f9ab6619f/lines/931f5a2c-45d7-4da1-b0e9-0b4c22cd6e3b/Doc REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;60668;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/cb4c67ef-14cd-4fd7-9df8-5c16db278eab/results/60b14d02-968a-4ff2-a843-c49f9ab6619f/lines/6ced2a54-edc9-4817-9f86-21748ecb09ca/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - PHILLIP MARTIN |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;40857;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/cb4c67ef-14cd-4fd7-9df8-5c16db278eab/results/60b14d02-968a-4ff2-a843-c49f9ab6619f/lines/fd656d25-2277-428f-a157-e27f28440cde/Doc NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;63593;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/cb4c67ef-14cd-4fd7-9df8-5c16db278eab/results/60b14d02-968a-4ff2-a843-c49f9ab6619f/lines/2b80a595-2aa5-4fb0-99b8-a10da10704ba/Doc CIVIL COVER SHEET |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;83965;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/cb4c67ef-14cd-4fd7-9df8-5c16db278eab/results/60b14d02-968a-4ff2-a843-c49f9ab6619f/lines/bd72049f-9469-4914-8581-d785f2707f2b/Doc COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.