Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Apex Bank, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Diaz Adam, against Coleman Kathleen M, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 CATHERINE L COMBEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2019 |
CategoryForjc - Foreign Judgment - Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF DEATH - KATHLEEN COLEMAN | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 05/05/2021 02:00 PM | |
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 05/07/2020 10:45 AM | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO ENTRY OF FINAL DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF DEFICIENCY | |
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.