Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
True Builders Inc Through Assignment From Donna Allen And Peter Allen, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 08 STEVEN L SELPH presiding.
Case Number |
Judge08 STEVEN L SELPH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryOthic - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DISMISSAL | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DIMSISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING (30 MINUTES SPECIL SET) | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 07/30/2019 01:45 PM | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 07/30/2019 01:45 PM | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.