Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wilmington Trust National Association Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee Of Mfra Trust 2014-2, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Tenant 2, Unknown Tenant 1, Huntington Hills Property Owners Association Inc, Unknown Spouse Of Hai Yang, Yang, Hai, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 WILLIAM D SITES presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 WILLIAM D SITES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS | |
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDICIAL DEFAULT - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF HAI YANG NKA XIAOHUI LU | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERKS DEFAULT/ HAI YANG AND HUNTINGTON HILLS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDICIAL DEFAULT | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS - UNKNOWN TENANT #1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT #2 | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;108642;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/3fc74202-afa9-47ab-839b-ed305e4c674c/results/bf0b7abf-ab50-4648-94ac-c1032968d223/lines/ec4b550c-6648-4f74-b7e9-4239d11e2456/Doc SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- HUNTINGTON HILLS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC BY SERVING IRMA COLE |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;197843;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/3fc74202-afa9-47ab-839b-ed305e4c674c/results/bf0b7abf-ab50-4648-94ac-c1032968d223/lines/9b119f10-20a7-4e9c-b0fb-4b28f8d33ffb/Doc SERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED- UNKNOWN TENANT 2 |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;158378;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/3fc74202-afa9-47ab-839b-ed305e4c674c/results/bf0b7abf-ab50-4648-94ac-c1032968d223/lines/2060e30e-b4c6-4e6c-bf50-a07d0de77b25/Doc SERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED- UNKNOWN TENANT 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.