Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Harville Darnel R, Parker Melinda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Turnbull Sanga T, against Mathieu Jean E, represented by Manno Steven D, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2019 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 10/29/2020 09:00 AM | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 10/29/2020 09:00 AM | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S DARNEL HARVILLE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MELINDA PARKER RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS DARNEL HARVILLE NOICE OF SERVING OF FILING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT JEAN | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MELINDA PARKER NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FILING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT JEAN | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.