Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Robinson Gloria J, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against Harbor Freight Tools Usa Inc, Rathbun, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 08 JAMES A YANCEY presiding.
Case Number |
Judge08 JAMES A YANCEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryNegpl - Negligence Premises Liability Comm |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
This complaint is filed by Gloria J. Robinson against Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. and Thomas Rathbun. The complaint alleges that on November 1, 2017, while Robinson was a customer at the Harbor Freight Tools store in Lakeland, Florida, she slipped...
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: March 26, 2020MEDIATORS REPORT- SETTLED
Date: February 13, 2020DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION
Date: February 10, 2020NOTICE OF APPERANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL
Date: February 10, 2020PLAINTIFF GLORIA J ROBINSON RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS USA INC'S SECOND REQUESTS
Date: November 26, 2019DEFENDANT HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS USA INC SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 06, 2019CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION
Date: October 28, 2019NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: October 28, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 08, 2019DEFENDANT HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS USA INC'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES
Date: July 10, 2019DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: June 07, 2019SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- THOMAS RATHBURN
Date: March 25, 2019DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 26, 2019DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: January 25, 2019SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS USA INC
Date: January 18, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - THOMAS RATHBUN
Date: December 31, 2018PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT
Date: December 31, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS USA INC
Date: December 31, 2018INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 31, 2018PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT THOMAS RATHBURN
Date: December 31, 2018PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS USA INC
Date: December 31, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICDE | |
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATORS REPORT- SETTLED | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPERANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS USA INC'S NOTICE THAT OBJECTION HAS BEEN FILED TO PRODUCTION UNDER | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF GLORIA J ROBINSON RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS USA INC'S SECOND REQUESTS | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HARBOOR FREIGHT TOOLS USA INCS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS USA INC SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.