Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Johnson, Cathy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Southern-Owners Insurance Company,, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 04 DANA Y MOORE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge04 DANA Y MOORE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Date: December 31, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 10/24/2019 09:00 AM | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANYS | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF JAMES GOFF | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CANCELLING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCEL..LATION OF MEDIATION | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM FOR USE AT TRIAL AND FOR ALL OTHER PERMISSIBLE | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY | |
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS THIRD NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.