Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb As Trustee Of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mansoor Nusrat, against Any And All Unknown Parties, City Of Lakeland Florida, Stadley Willie, Unknown Heirs Beneficiaries Devisees Surviving Spouse Grantees Assignee Lienors Creditors Trustees And All Other Parties, Unknown Tenant 1, (total of 6) See All represented by Davis Palmer C, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 WILLIAM D SITES presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 WILLIAM D SITES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryRpmfn - Foreclosure Non Homestead Resident |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
CLERK OF COURTS FILING LOCATION OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENT
Date: January 30, 2020ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE
Date: January 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | POST SALE PAYMENT | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM PERFECT ATTENDANCE | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER 45 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.