Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
O'Neal, Patrick Lance, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Legacy Carriers Llc, Sharp, Andre, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 CATHERINE L COMBEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: January 18, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- LEGACY CARRIERS, LLC
Date: December 27, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE / RECEIVED BY JUDGE | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY | |
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- LEGACY CARRIERS, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.