Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank Trust Na As Trustee For Lsf9 Master Participation Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Diaz, David, Diaz, Nicole, Florida Housing Finance Corporation, Lake Davenport Estates West Homeowners Association Inc, Unknown Spouse Of Nicole Diaz, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 08 JAMES A YANCEY presiding.
Case Number |
Judge08 JAMES A YANCEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryRpmfn - Foreclosure Non Homestead Resident |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: August 23, 2019MORTGAGE
Date: March 11, 2019CLERK OF COURTS FILING LOCATION OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENT
Date: March 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ORIGINAL DOCUMENT | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOITON TO DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULE | |
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 04/18/2019 10:15 AM | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURTS FILING LOCATION OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENT | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | MORTGAGE | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ADJUSTABLE RATE NOTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.