Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Freedom Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hall Christine Lankey, against Dahlquist, David W, Dahlquist, Evelyn, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Unknown Tenants Owners 1, Unknown Tenants Owners 2, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: September 26, 2019FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: July 09, 2019CLERK OF COURTS FILING LOCATION OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENT
Date: April 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE REINSTATE LOAN DOCUMENTS AND DISMISS CASE | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF MAIL ADDRESS | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLA R JUD ADMIN 2 516 | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | COPY OF REQUESTED CHECK | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | REFUND OF CREDIT CARD OR E PORTAL | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLA R JUD ADMIN 2.516 | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | COPY OF REQUESTED CHECK | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED CHECK REQUEST - CIVIL LAW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.