Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Brown Nataija, against Slighter, Scott, represented by Florin Scott C, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 08 JAMES A YANCEY presiding.
Case Number |
Judge08 JAMES A YANCEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 27, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY - SCOTT SLIGHTER | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PDOCUTION OF DOCUMENTS | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY INCLUDING INTERROGATORIES REQUEST FOR | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.