Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bridgefield Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Bp Agency Llc, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 WILLIAM D SITES presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 WILLIAM D SITES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DFAULT JUDGMENT | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 11/05/2019 04:00 PM | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | ALIAS SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- AGENCY LLC BY SERVING CAROLINE C MYERS | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
July 13, 2019 | Docket Event | ALIAS SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- BP AGENCY LLC BY SERVING LATASHA RUCKER | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-BP AGENCY LLC BY SERVING SUZANE HAWKS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.