Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gardiner, Matthew, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Security First Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 08 JAMES A YANCEY presiding.
Case Number |
Judge08 JAMES A YANCEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: May 07, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY BY SERVING JOSH HERSHEL | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.