Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Twillie, Destiny J, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Progressive Select Insurance Company, Sean Bogle Esquire As Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Anna M Smith M, Smith, Larry A, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
This complaint is filed by Destiny J. Twillie against Anna M. Smith and Larry A. Smith in the Circuit Court of the Tenth Judicial Circuit in Polk County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages exceeding $15,000. The plaintiff alleges that on January 18...
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 06, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: December 19, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516
Date: September 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PRGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION CROSS NOTICE | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE AT ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL OF SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.