Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bacchus, Shanta, Bacchus, Shaikh, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Heritage Property And Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryOthic - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
May 27, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY INCLUDING REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.