Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc Dba Champion Mortgage Co, filed a(n) case against The Bluffs Of Christina Condominium Association Inc, Timmons Barbara S, United States Of America Acting On Behalf Of The Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Unknown Spouse Of Barbara S Timmons, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with William D. Sites presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam D. Sites Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT
Date: July 29, 2019IN REM FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: May 17, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: December 20, 2018DEFAULT ISSUED TO BARBARA S TIMMONS; THE BLUFFS OD CHRISTINA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC
Date: January 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE | |
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING-AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES; AFFIDAVIT AS TO TIME, EFFORT AND COSTS | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | IN REM FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.